THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:52:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temmy Latner Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor, Box #13
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 6149
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldman (CPSO#: 66463 )
Business Address: Temmy Latner Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temmy Latner Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor, Box #13
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 6149
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldman (CPSO#: 66463 )
Business Address: Temmy Latner Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7884

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993