THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4800 Leslie Street
Suite 311
Willowdale Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-5439
Fax: (416) 229-2513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Kahane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kahane (CPSO#: 66465 )
Business Address: Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 222-5439

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4800 Leslie Street
Suite 311
Willowdale Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-5439
Fax: (416) 229-2513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Kahane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kahane (CPSO#: 66465 )
Business Address: Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 222-5439

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN GARY KAHANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN GARY KAHANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993