THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:18:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vibrant Medical Clinic
2640 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-553-3730
Fax: (905) 553-3735
Address: Dufferin Vaughan Medical Clinic
9200 Dufferin Street
Concord Ontario L4K 0C6
Phone: (905) 417-3125
Fax: (905) 417-3105
Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087
Address: West Vaughan Medical Centre
Woodbridge Ontario
3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 3G8
Phone: 905-417-5461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Rotundo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotundo (CPSO#: 66475 )
Business Address: Suite 100
2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
(905) 553-3730
Business Address: 9200 Rutherford Road
Concord Ontario L4K 0C6
(904) 417-3125
Business Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
(416) 780-9986
Business Address: 3900 Rutherford Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 3G8
(905) 471-5461

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vibrant Medical Clinic
2640 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-553-3730
Fax: (905) 553-3735
Address: Dufferin Vaughan Medical Clinic
9200 Dufferin Street
Concord Ontario L4K 0C6
Phone: (905) 417-3125
Fax: (905) 417-3105
Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087
Address: West Vaughan Medical Centre
Woodbridge Ontario
3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 3G8
Phone: 905-417-5461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Rotundo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotundo (CPSO#: 66475 )
Business Address: Suite 100
2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
(905) 553-3730
Business Address: 9200 Rutherford Road
Concord Ontario L4K 0C6
(904) 417-3125
Business Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
(416) 780-9986
Business Address: 3900 Rutherford Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 3G8
(905) 471-5461

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK JOHN ROTUNDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTUNDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK JOHN ROTUNDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTUNDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993