THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:28:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Sabir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabir (CPSO#: 66476 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-2111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Sabir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabir (CPSO#: 66476 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-2111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA SABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA SABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993