THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 10
2563 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-1900
Fax: (905) 303-1196
Address: 200 Wellington street W
Barrie Ontario L4N1K9
Phone: 9053031900
Fax: 9053031196
Address: 1354 Innisfil Beach Rd
Innisfil ON L9S 4B7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani (CPSO#: 66477 )
Business Address: 3B-484 Holland St W
Bradford ON L3Z 0A2
9053031900
Business Address: 200 Wellington Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 1K9
(844) 303-1900
Business Address: 10 - 2563 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 2E8
(905) 303-1900
Business Address: 1-225 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 0J4
(905) 303-1900
Business Address: 1354 Innisfil Beach Rd
Innisfil ON L9S 4B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 10
2563 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-1900
Fax: (905) 303-1196
Address: 200 Wellington street W
Barrie Ontario L4N1K9
Phone: 9053031900
Fax: 9053031196
Address: 1354 Innisfil Beach Rd
Innisfil ON L9S 4B7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani (CPSO#: 66477 )
Business Address: 3B-484 Holland St W
Bradford ON L3Z 0A2
9053031900
Business Address: 200 Wellington Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 1K9
(844) 303-1900
Business Address: 10 - 2563 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 2E8
(905) 303-1900
Business Address: 1-225 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 0J4
(905) 303-1900
Business Address: 1354 Innisfil Beach Rd
Innisfil ON L9S 4B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AZAM SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AZAM SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993