THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
2920 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6B 3S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-2211
Fax: 416-782-2392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Sedran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sedran (CPSO#: 66500 )
Business Address: Suite 200
2920 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6B 3S8
(416) 787-2211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
2920 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6B 3S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-2211
Fax: 416-782-2392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Sedran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sedran (CPSO#: 66500 )
Business Address: Suite 200
2920 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6B 3S8
(416) 787-2211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SEDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SEDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993