THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London Ontario N5W 6A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 659-1900
Fax: (519) 659-8575

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas W.H. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tam (CPSO#: 66508 )
Business Address: London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London Ontario N5W 6A2
(519) 659-1900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London Ontario N5W 6A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 659-1900
Fax: (519) 659-8575

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas W.H. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tam (CPSO#: 66508 )
Business Address: London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London Ontario N5W 6A2
(519) 659-1900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS WING HIM TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS WING HIM TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993