THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:37:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea Medical Centre
Suite 406/408
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-2280
Fax: (905) 792-9832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Cherepacha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cherepacha (CPSO#: 66520 )
Business Address: Bramalea Medical Centre
408/406 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(416) 791-3234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea Medical Centre
Suite 406/408
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-2280
Fax: (905) 792-9832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Cherepacha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cherepacha (CPSO#: 66520 )
Business Address: Bramalea Medical Centre
408/406 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(416) 791-3234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LEIGH CHEREPACHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEREPACHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LEIGH CHEREPACHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEREPACHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993