THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:42:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 513
2425 Bloor St W
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 760-8763
Fax: (647) 689-2276
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6118
Fax: (416) 530-6291
Address: Suite 600
340 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
7 Donnelly - 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3488
Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
7 Donnelly
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168677422
Fax: 4168673688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Derzko-Dzulynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Derzko-Dzulynsky (CPSO#: 66521 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 513
Toronto Ontario M6S 1P9

Corporation Name: Dr. Derzko-Dzulynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Derzko-Dzulynsky (CPSO#: 66521 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 513
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 760-8763
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6118
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital, Eye Clinic
61 Queen Street East
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 867-7422
Business Address: Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-1335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 513
2425 Bloor St W
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 760-8763
Fax: (647) 689-2276
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6118
Fax: (416) 530-6291
Address: Suite 600
340 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
7 Donnelly - 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3488
Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
7 Donnelly
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168677422
Fax: 4168673688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Derzko-Dzulynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Derzko-Dzulynsky (CPSO#: 66521 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 513
Toronto Ontario M6S 1P9

Corporation Name: Dr. Derzko-Dzulynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Derzko-Dzulynsky (CPSO#: 66521 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 513
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 760-8763
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6118
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital, Eye Clinic
61 Queen Street East
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 867-7422
Business Address: Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-1335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARISSA ANNE DERZKO-DZULYNSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERZKO-DZULYNSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARISSA ANNE DERZKO-DZULYNSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERZKO-DZULYNSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993