THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:14:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Minden Hospital Site
LOCATION: Minden

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanleeuwen Lingertat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lingertat (CPSO#: 66528 ) Dr. J. Vanleeuwen (CPSO#: 66510 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Minden Hospital Site
LOCATION: Minden

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanleeuwen Lingertat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lingertat (CPSO#: 66528 ) Dr. J. Vanleeuwen (CPSO#: 66510 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD LINGERTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGERTAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD LINGERTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGERTAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Sep 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Sep 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993