THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:13:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 7 - 124
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Extension: 3428
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Address: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Liu (CPSO#: 66529 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 7-124
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000 Extn: 3428

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 7 - 124
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Extension: 3428
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Address: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Liu (CPSO#: 66529 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 7-124
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000 Extn: 3428

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993