THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:23:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MEDICAL CENTRE
430 The Boardwalk, Suite 201
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-7911
Fax: (519) 749-5644

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Renner (CPSO#: 66532 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 201
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 749-7911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MEDICAL CENTRE
430 The Boardwalk, Suite 201
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-7911
Fax: (519) 749-5644

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Renner (CPSO#: 66532 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 201
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 749-7911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE RENNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE RENNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993