THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:39:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 8-706
101 College St.
Toronto Ontario M5G 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2838
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schimmer (CPSO#: 66533 )
Business Address: Room 8-706
101 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1L7
(416) 946-2838

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 8-706
101 College St.
Toronto Ontario M5G 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2838
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schimmer (CPSO#: 66533 )
Business Address: Room 8-706
101 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1L7
(416) 946-2838

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON DAVID SCHIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIMMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON DAVID SCHIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIMMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993