THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:37:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 275 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M5T 2W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 647-490-6330
Address: 1 Eglinton Avenue East, Suite 604
Toronto Ontario M4P 3A1
Phone: 416-485-0555
Fax: 416-485-2555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Leong-Poi and I. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yang (CPSO#: 66538 ) Dr. H. Leong-Poi (CPSO#: 65521 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 6-044
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5845
Business Address: 1 Eglinton Ave E
Suite 604
Toronto ON M4P 3A1
416-485-0555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 275 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M5T 2W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 647-490-6330
Address: 1 Eglinton Avenue East, Suite 604
Toronto Ontario M4P 3A1
Phone: 416-485-0555
Fax: 416-485-2555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Leong-Poi and I. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yang (CPSO#: 66538 ) Dr. H. Leong-Poi (CPSO#: 65521 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 6-044
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5845
Business Address: 1 Eglinton Ave E
Suite 604
Toronto ON M4P 3A1
416-485-0555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IWAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IWAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993