THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 648-0770
Fax: (905) 648-0777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Antoniuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Antoniuk (CPSO#: 66540 )
Business Address: 326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 2C2
(905) 648-0770

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 648-0770
Fax: (905) 648-0777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Antoniuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Antoniuk (CPSO#: 66540 )
Business Address: 326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 2C2
(905) 648-0770

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN MARIE ANTONIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN MARIE ANTONIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993