THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:15:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137252000
Fax: 6137251300
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
CIVIC site TOH
MAiD Office
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 10301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Box230
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8132
Fax: (613) 739-6177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Johnston (CPSO#: 66544 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137252000
Fax: 6137251300
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
CIVIC site TOH
MAiD Office
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 10301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Box230
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8132
Fax: (613) 739-6177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Johnston (CPSO#: 66544 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993