THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:47:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Canada Family Health Team
100 Strowger Blvd
Entrance 2B
Suite 110
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-423-3333
Fax: (613) 423-3334
Address: 100 Marie-Curie Private
Byward Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9N3
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Habib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Habib (CPSO#: 66556 )
Business Address: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
(613) 423-3333 Extn: 226
Business Address: 300-100 Marie curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Canada Family Health Team
100 Strowger Blvd
Entrance 2B
Suite 110
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-423-3333
Fax: (613) 423-3334
Address: 100 Marie-Curie Private
Byward Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9N3
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Habib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Habib (CPSO#: 66556 )
Business Address: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
(613) 423-3333 Extn: 226
Business Address: 300-100 Marie curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993