THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Extension: 1501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 386 King St
Midland Ontario L4R 3M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. P. Beeston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beeston (CPSO#: 66582 )
Business Address: Huronia District Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300
Business Address: 3-289 King Street
Midland Ontario L4R 3M5
(705) 527-4641

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Extension: 1501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 386 King St
Midland Ontario L4R 3M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. P. Beeston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beeston (CPSO#: 66582 )
Business Address: Huronia District Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300
Business Address: 3-289 King Street
Midland Ontario L4R 3M5
(705) 527-4641

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERY PHILIP BEESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEESTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERY PHILIP BEESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEESTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993