THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:14:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 206
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-275-8688
Fax: 905-275-1094

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Cheah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheah (CPSO#: 66585 )
Business Address: King Street Medical Arts Centre
Suite 406
71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 275-8688
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
Suite 206
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
905-275-8688

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 206
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-275-8688
Fax: 905-275-1094

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Cheah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheah (CPSO#: 66585 )
Business Address: King Street Medical Arts Centre
Suite 406
71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 275-8688
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
Suite 206
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
905-275-8688

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY KAH-LOON CHEAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY KAH-LOON CHEAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993