THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:25:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Imaging Services
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: KMI X-Ray and Ultra Sound
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: (613) 384-5488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. Ricketts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ricketts (CPSO#: 66593 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Department of Imaging Services
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: KMI X-Ray and Ultrasound
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-5488

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Imaging Services
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: KMI X-Ray and Ultra Sound
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: (613) 384-5488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. Ricketts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ricketts (CPSO#: 66593 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Department of Imaging Services
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: KMI X-Ray and Ultrasound
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-5488

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS RICKETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICKETTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS RICKETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICKETTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993