THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 403
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-5393
Fax: (613) 746-4840

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. V. Hassard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hassard (CPSO#: 66619 )
Business Address: 403-595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 746-5393
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Corporation Name: Hassard & Rodrigue Medicine Professional Corporation/Hassard et Rodrigue Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 May 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 403
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-5393
Fax: (613) 746-4840

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. V. Hassard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hassard (CPSO#: 66619 )
Business Address: 403-595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 746-5393
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Corporation Name: Hassard & Rodrigue Medicine Professional Corporation/Hassard et Rodrigue Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 May 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP VICTOR HASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP VICTOR HASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993