THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 603 0630
Fax: 519 603 0885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hupel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hupel (CPSO#: 66620 )
Business Address: 675 Queen St S
Kitchener ON N2M 1A1
519 603 0630
Business Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
519 603 0630
Business Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
519 603 0630

Corporation Name: Hupel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 603 0630
Fax: 519 603 0885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hupel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hupel (CPSO#: 66620 )
Business Address: 675 Queen St S
Kitchener ON N2M 1A1
519 603 0630
Business Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
519 603 0630
Business Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
519 603 0630

Corporation Name: Hupel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS MANFRED HUPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUPEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS MANFRED HUPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUPEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993