THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kaminker, Richard Stephen (Used Until: 03 Apr 2007)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202 The Court
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 287-2335
Fax: 4162877991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Tarek-Kaminker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tarek-Kaminker (CPSO#: 66622 )
Business Address: 202 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
The Court
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 287-2335

General Information

Former Name: Kaminker, Richard Stephen (Used Until: 03 Apr 2007)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202 The Court
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 287-2335
Fax: 4162877991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Tarek-Kaminker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tarek-Kaminker (CPSO#: 66622 )
Business Address: 202 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
The Court
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 287-2335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD STEPHEN TAREK-KAMINKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREK-KAMINKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD STEPHEN TAREK-KAMINKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREK-KAMINKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993