THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2590
Fax: 416-495-2479
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7477
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher W. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 66646 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 404-4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-7277
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B8
(416) 284-8131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2590
Fax: 416-495-2479
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7477
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher W. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 66646 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 404-4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-7277
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B8
(416) 284-8131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WING-HAY LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WING-HAY LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993