THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-2 Gurdwara Rd
Ottawa ON K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Bigelow Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bigelow (CPSO#: 66653 )
Business Address: 311 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
(613) 274-7457
Business Address: 2 Gurdwara Rd
Canada
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
613-216-1823

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-2 Gurdwara Rd
Ottawa ON K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Bigelow Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bigelow (CPSO#: 66653 )
Business Address: 311 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
(613) 274-7457
Business Address: 2 Gurdwara Rd
Canada
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
613-216-1823

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC BIGELOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGELOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC BIGELOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGELOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993