THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 466-4828
Fax: (416) 466-5394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spiros Konstantatos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Konstantatos (CPSO#: 66669 )
Business Address: 855 Broadview Avenue
Suite 101
Toronto Ontario M4K 3Z1
(416) 466-4828

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 466-4828
Fax: (416) 466-5394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spiros Konstantatos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Konstantatos (CPSO#: 66669 )
Business Address: 855 Broadview Avenue
Suite 101
Toronto Ontario M4K 3Z1
(416) 466-4828

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPIROS KONSTANTATOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONSTANTATOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPIROS KONSTANTATOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONSTANTATOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993