THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:39:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Saint Clair Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194361100
Fax: 5194361106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stone (CPSO#: 66678 )
Business Address: 110 - 857 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 436-1100
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2A7
(519) 352-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Saint Clair Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194361100
Fax: 5194361106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stone (CPSO#: 66678 )
Business Address: 110 - 857 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 436-1100
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2A7
(519) 352-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN FRANCIS STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN FRANCIS STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993