THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 MacKay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Ward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ward (CPSO#: 66679 )
Business Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 McKay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 MacKay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Ward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ward (CPSO#: 66679 )
Business Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 McKay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL WILLIAM WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL WILLIAM WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993