THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:47:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Downs Family Practice
Suite O
425 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 569-8821
Fax: (519) 569-8823

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Doris Winfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Winfield (CPSO#: 66681 )
Business Address: University Downs Family Practice
425 University Avenue East
Suite O
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4C9
(519) 569-8821

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Downs Family Practice
Suite O
425 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 569-8821
Fax: (519) 569-8823

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Doris Winfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Winfield (CPSO#: 66681 )
Business Address: University Downs Family Practice
425 University Avenue East
Suite O
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4C9
(519) 569-8821

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DORIS JOANNE WINFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DORIS JOANNE WINFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993