THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:18:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NYGH Elder Care Centre
243 Consumers Road, 3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756 6871
Fax: 416 756 6438
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F.T. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wong (CPSO#: 66682 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: NYGH Elder Care Centre
243 Consumers Rd
Suite 300
North York ON M2J 4W8
416 756 6438
Business Address: NYGH Elder Care Centre
300 - 243 Consumers Road
North York ON M2J 4W8
14167566871 Extn: 8513

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NYGH Elder Care Centre
243 Consumers Road, 3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756 6871
Fax: 416 756 6438
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F.T. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wong (CPSO#: 66682 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: NYGH Elder Care Centre
243 Consumers Rd
Suite 300
North York ON M2J 4W8
416 756 6438
Business Address: NYGH Elder Care Centre
300 - 243 Consumers Road
North York ON M2J 4W8
14167566871 Extn: 8513

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN TZE-YEN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN TZE-YEN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993