THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:39:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1 - 110 Turnbull Court
Cambridge ON N1T 1K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196248671
Fax: 5196248696

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heitzner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Heitzner (CPSO#: 66692 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 201
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 749-7911
Business Address: 110 Turnbull Crt
Cambridge ON N1T 1K6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1 - 110 Turnbull Court
Cambridge ON N1T 1K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196248671
Fax: 5196248696

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heitzner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Heitzner (CPSO#: 66692 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 201
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 749-7911
Business Address: 110 Turnbull Crt
Cambridge ON N1T 1K6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DANIEL HEITZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEITZNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DANIEL HEITZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEITZNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993