THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:25:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Radiology/Nuclear Imaging Dept
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 895 4521
Extension: 2716
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883 1212
Extension: 7112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 216
Vaughan Ontario L6A4P9
Phone: 289 553 5040
Fax: 289 553 6336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y Siow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Siow (CPSO#: 66696 )
Business Address: 216 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-5040
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Radiology / Nuclear Imaging Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Radiology/Nuclear Imaging Dept
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 895 4521
Extension: 2716
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883 1212
Extension: 7112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 216
Vaughan Ontario L6A4P9
Phone: 289 553 5040
Fax: 289 553 6336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y Siow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Siow (CPSO#: 66696 )
Business Address: 216 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-5040
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Radiology / Nuclear Imaging Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIN-HUI SIOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIN-HUI SIOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993