THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Radiation Medicine Program
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2132
Fax: (416) 946-6566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Ann Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dawson (CPSO#: 66716 )
Business Address: Radiation Medicine Program
UHN- Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2132
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
6-315 OPG
Toronto ON M5G 2M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Radiation Medicine Program
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2132
Fax: (416) 946-6566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Ann Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dawson (CPSO#: 66716 )
Business Address: Radiation Medicine Program
UHN- Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2132
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
6-315 OPG
Toronto ON M5G 2M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ANN DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ANN DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993