THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Catharine Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 478-5221
Fax: (905) 834-9067
Address: 309 Ridge Rd N
Ridgeway Ontario L0S 1N0
Phone: 289 478 5221
Fax: 905 834 9067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Remington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Remington (CPSO#: 66725 )
Business Address: 103 Charlotte Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 3E2
(289) 478-5221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Catharine Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 478-5221
Fax: (905) 834-9067
Address: 309 Ridge Rd N
Ridgeway Ontario L0S 1N0
Phone: 289 478 5221
Fax: 905 834 9067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Remington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Remington (CPSO#: 66725 )
Business Address: 103 Charlotte Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 3E2
(289) 478-5221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEPHEN REMINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMINGTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEPHEN REMINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMINGTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993