THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:05:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169222672
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Bendale Acres Long-Term Care/City of Toronto
3rd floor
BA3
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T8
Phone: 416-397-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Auger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Auger (CPSO#: 66733 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169222672
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Bendale Acres Long-Term Care/City of Toronto
3rd floor
BA3
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T8
Phone: 416-397-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Auger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Auger (CPSO#: 66733 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993