THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Armogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Armogan (CPSO#: 66736 )
Business Address: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
(905) 212-9482

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Armogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Armogan (CPSO#: 66736 )
Business Address: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
(905) 212-9482

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARENDRA ARMOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMOGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARENDRA ARMOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMOGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993