THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:31:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-7277
Fax: (416) 299-4842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wayne Ho Ping Kong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ho Ping Kong (CPSO#: 66753 )
Business Address: 404 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-7277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-7277
Fax: (416) 299-4842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wayne Ho Ping Kong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ho Ping Kong (CPSO#: 66753 )
Business Address: 404 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-7277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE HO PING KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO PING KONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE HO PING KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO PING KONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993