THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:10:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3U7 M U M C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 76401
Fax: 905 521 4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Longden Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jones (CPSO#: 66755 )
Business Address: B1-106E
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 40819
Business Address: ICU
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43486
Business Address: 3U7
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76401

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3U7 M U M C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 76401
Fax: 905 521 4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Longden Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jones (CPSO#: 66755 )
Business Address: B1-106E
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 40819
Business Address: ICU
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43486
Business Address: 3U7
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76401

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM LONGDEN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM LONGDEN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993