THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:08:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505-505 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 317-7299
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre,
30 The Queensway,
Toronto, Ontario
M6R 1B5
Date Received: 03 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marshall (CPSO#: 66769 )
Business Address: 4163177299
Business Address: 505-505 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B1

Corporation Name: M. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505-505 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 317-7299
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre,
30 The Queensway,
Toronto, Ontario
M6R 1B5
Date Received: 03 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marshall (CPSO#: 66769 )
Business Address: 4163177299
Business Address: 505-505 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B1

Corporation Name: M. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE THERESA MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE THERESA MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993