THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 433-4345
Fax: (905) 721-4881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massabki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Massabki (CPSO#: 66771 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 433-4345

Corporation Name: Massabki and Massaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Apr 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 433-4345
Fax: (905) 721-4881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massabki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Massabki (CPSO#: 66771 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 433-4345

Corporation Name: Massabki and Massaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Apr 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAOUF ALBERT YOUSSEF MASSABKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSABKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAOUF ALBERT YOUSSEF MASSABKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSABKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993