THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St, Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548 7827
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John A. McGugan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGugan (CPSO#: 66800 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St.
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
(613) 548-3232

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St, Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548 7827
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John A. McGugan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGugan (CPSO#: 66800 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St.
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
(613) 548-3232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER MCGUGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER MCGUGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993