THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:31:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 417 Lasalle Blvd.
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-3001
Fax: 7056713003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Rheault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rheault (CPSO#: 66824 )
Business Address: 417 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1W8
(705) 671-3001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 417 Lasalle Blvd.
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-3001
Fax: 7056713003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Rheault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rheault (CPSO#: 66824 )
Business Address: 417 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1W8
(705) 671-3001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LUC CLAUDE RHEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LUC CLAUDE RHEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993