THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:05:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-5706

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Van Noppen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Noppen (CPSO#: 65096 ) Dr. B. Van Noppen (CPSO#: 66827 )
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls Hospital - Perth Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500
Business Address: 12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
(613) 267-1660

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-5706

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Van Noppen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Noppen (CPSO#: 65096 ) Dr. B. Van Noppen (CPSO#: 66827 )
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls Hospital - Perth Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500
Business Address: 12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
(613) 267-1660

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOUDEWIJN JOHANNES VAN NOPPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN NOPPEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOUDEWIJN JOHANNES VAN NOPPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN NOPPEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993