THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:08:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202- 1448 Lawrence Ave East
North York ON M4A 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-752-5426
Fax: 647-689-6254

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeny Oda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oda (CPSO#: 66851 )
Business Address: Suite 202
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York Ontario M4A 2V6
(416) 752-5426

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202- 1448 Lawrence Ave East
North York ON M4A 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-752-5426
Fax: 647-689-6254

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeny Oda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oda (CPSO#: 66851 )
Business Address: Suite 202
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York Ontario M4A 2V6
(416) 752-5426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENY WADIE NASSIEF ODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENY WADIE NASSIEF ODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993