THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:29:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
Toronto ON M4A 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167525426
Fax: 6476896254
Address: 2933 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E9
Phone: (416) 499-8338
Fax: (416) 752-7332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Mati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mati (CPSO#: 66852 )
Business Address: 2933 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E9
(416) 499-8338
Business Address: Suite 202
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4A 2V6
(416) 752-5426

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
Toronto ON M4A 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167525426
Fax: 6476896254
Address: 2933 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E9
Phone: (416) 499-8338
Fax: (416) 752-7332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Mati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mati (CPSO#: 66852 )
Business Address: 2933 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E9
(416) 499-8338
Business Address: Suite 202
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4A 2V6
(416) 752-5426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL MOSA MATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL MOSA MATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993