THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 3-080 Bond Wing South
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5703
Fax: (416) 864-5770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Ginsberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ginsberg (CPSO#: 66861 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing South
Room 3-080
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5703

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 3-080 Bond Wing South
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5703
Fax: (416) 864-5770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Ginsberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ginsberg (CPSO#: 66861 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing South
Room 3-080
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5703

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD JOESEPH GINSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD JOESEPH GINSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993