THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:56:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite J157
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4534
Fax: (613) 761-4637

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan S.L. Liew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liew (CPSO#: 66864 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
J157 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4534

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite J157
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4534
Fax: (613) 761-4637

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan S.L. Liew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liew (CPSO#: 66864 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
J157 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4534

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN SYNG-LUAN LIEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN SYNG-LUAN LIEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993