THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 880 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H2
Phone: 9055750808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 836 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9C 3A4
Phone: 9053856777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roopa D. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Arora (CPSO#: 66871 )
Business Address: 867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
(905) 574-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 880 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H2
Phone: 9055750808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 836 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9C 3A4
Phone: 9053856777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roopa D. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Arora (CPSO#: 66871 )
Business Address: 867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
(905) 574-2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROOPA DEVAKI ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROOPA DEVAKI ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993