THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Room M320
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33542
Fax: (905) 521-6153

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Rabbat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rabbat (CPSO#: 66872 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital Hamilton
Room M318
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33542
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 327 Reynolds Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
(905) 815-5111
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1S7
(905) 527-4322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Room M320
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33542
Fax: (905) 521-6153

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Rabbat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rabbat (CPSO#: 66872 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital Hamilton
Room M318
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33542
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 327 Reynolds Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
(905) 815-5111
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1S7
(905) 527-4322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN GEORGE RABBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN GEORGE RABBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993