THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:10:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o Emergency Department
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bradford (CPSO#: 66895 )
Business Address: 8930 Disputed Rd
LaSalle ON N9H0H9
15199999459
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4401
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o Emergency Department
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bradford (CPSO#: 66895 )
Business Address: 8930 Disputed Rd
LaSalle ON N9H0H9
15199999459
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4401
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL BRADFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL BRADFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993